uscitizen
Villified User
106th Congress (1999-2001)
Majority Leader: Trent Lott (R-MS)
Minority Leader: Thomas A. Daschle (D-SD)
-------------------------------------------------------------------------------
107th Congress (2001-2003)
Majority Leader: Thomas A. Daschle (D-SD)
Minority Leader: Trent Lott (R-MS)
Note: From January 3 to January 20, 2001, with the Senate divided evenly between the two parties, the Democrats held the majority due to the deciding vote of outgoing Democratic Vice President Al Gore. Senator Thomas A. Daschle served as majority leader at that time. Beginning on January 20, 2001, Republican Vice President Richard Cheney held the deciding vote, giving the majority to the Republicans. Senator Trent Lott resumed his position as majority leader on that date. On May 24, 2001, Senator James Jeffords of Vermont announced his switch from Republican to Independent status, effective June 6, 2001. He announced that he would caucus with the Democrats, giving that party a one-seat advantage and changing control of the Senate back to the Democrats. Thomas A. Daschle again became majority leader on June 6, 2001. Trent Lott announced on December 20, 2002, that he would not continue as Republican leader in the 108th Congress. William Frist was elected Republican leader on Dec. 23, 2002, and began service on January 7, 2003.
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
108th Congress (2003-2005)
Majority Leader: William H. Frist (R-TN)
Minority Leader: Thomas A. Daschle (D-SD)
Note: Senator Thomas Daschle lost his reelection bid on November 2, 2004, and retired from the Senate on January 3, 2005. Democratic Whip Harry M. Reid was elected to the post for the 109th Congress.
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
109th Congress (2005-2007)
Majority Leader: William H. Frist (R-TN)
Minority Leader: Harry M. Reid (D-NV)
Note: Senator William Frist retired from the Senate on January 3, 2007. Republican Whip Mitch McConnell was elected to the post of Republican Leader on November 15, 2006, for the 110th Congress.
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
110th Congress (2007-2009)
Majority Leader: Harry M. Reid (D-NV)
Minority Leader: Mitch McConnell (R-KY)
-------------------------------------------------------------------------------
111th Congress (2009-2011)
Majority Leader: Harry M. Reid (D-NV)
Minority Leader: Mitch McConnell (R-KY)
http://www.senate.gov/artandhistory/history/common/briefing/Majority_Minority_Leaders.htm#2
Majority Leader: Trent Lott (R-MS)
Minority Leader: Thomas A. Daschle (D-SD)
-------------------------------------------------------------------------------
107th Congress (2001-2003)
Majority Leader: Thomas A. Daschle (D-SD)
Minority Leader: Trent Lott (R-MS)
Note: From January 3 to January 20, 2001, with the Senate divided evenly between the two parties, the Democrats held the majority due to the deciding vote of outgoing Democratic Vice President Al Gore. Senator Thomas A. Daschle served as majority leader at that time. Beginning on January 20, 2001, Republican Vice President Richard Cheney held the deciding vote, giving the majority to the Republicans. Senator Trent Lott resumed his position as majority leader on that date. On May 24, 2001, Senator James Jeffords of Vermont announced his switch from Republican to Independent status, effective June 6, 2001. He announced that he would caucus with the Democrats, giving that party a one-seat advantage and changing control of the Senate back to the Democrats. Thomas A. Daschle again became majority leader on June 6, 2001. Trent Lott announced on December 20, 2002, that he would not continue as Republican leader in the 108th Congress. William Frist was elected Republican leader on Dec. 23, 2002, and began service on January 7, 2003.
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
108th Congress (2003-2005)
Majority Leader: William H. Frist (R-TN)
Minority Leader: Thomas A. Daschle (D-SD)
Note: Senator Thomas Daschle lost his reelection bid on November 2, 2004, and retired from the Senate on January 3, 2005. Democratic Whip Harry M. Reid was elected to the post for the 109th Congress.
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
109th Congress (2005-2007)
Majority Leader: William H. Frist (R-TN)
Minority Leader: Harry M. Reid (D-NV)
Note: Senator William Frist retired from the Senate on January 3, 2007. Republican Whip Mitch McConnell was elected to the post of Republican Leader on November 15, 2006, for the 110th Congress.
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
110th Congress (2007-2009)
Majority Leader: Harry M. Reid (D-NV)
Minority Leader: Mitch McConnell (R-KY)
-------------------------------------------------------------------------------
111th Congress (2009-2011)
Majority Leader: Harry M. Reid (D-NV)
Minority Leader: Mitch McConnell (R-KY)
http://www.senate.gov/artandhistory/history/common/briefing/Majority_Minority_Leaders.htm#2